Senate | 03/12/2025 | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | (S) 3rd Reading Failed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/10/2025 | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/07/2025 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/06/2025 | (S) First Reading | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | (S) Introduced | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester | ||
House | 12/09/2024 | (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery | ||
House | 12/07/2024 | (LC) Draft in Assembly | ||
House | 12/06/2024 | (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review | ||
House | 12/06/2024 | (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | (LC) Draft in Edit | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | (LC) Draft in Legal Review | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | (LC) Drafter Assigned |