Senate | 03/12/2025 | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Highways and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | (S) Fiscal Note Unsigned | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Highways and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | (S) First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | (S) Introduced | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | (LC) Draft in Assembly | ||
House | 02/23/2025 | (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | (LC) Draft in Edit | ||
House | 02/16/2025 | (LC) Draft in Legal Review | ||
House | 12/15/2024 | (LC) Draft On Hold | ||
House | 11/27/2024 | (LC) Drafter Assigned |