Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
(S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
(S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
(S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
(S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
(S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
(S) Revised Fiscal Note Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
(S) Fiscal Note Printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
(S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
(S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
(S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2025
|
(S) Fiscal Note Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2025
|
(S) Hearing (S) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
(S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2025
|
(S) First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2025
|
(S) Fiscal Note Unsigned
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2025
|
(S) Fiscal Note Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2025
|
(S) Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2025
|
(LC) Draft Delivered to Requester
|
|
|
House
|
12/30/2024
|
(LC) Draft Ready for Delivery
|
|
|
House
|
12/30/2024
|
(LC) Draft in Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
12/29/2024
|
(LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review
|
|
|
House
|
12/09/2024
|
(LC) Draft in Input/Proofing
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2024
|
(LC) Draft in Edit
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
(LC) Draft in Legal Review
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2024
|
(LC) Drafter Assigned
|
|
|