Senate | 04/30/2025 | (S) Filed with Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | (S) Signed by President | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | (S) Resolution Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (S) State Administration | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (S) State Administration | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) State Administration | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | (S) First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | (S) Introduced | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | (LC) Draft in Assembly | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | (LC) Draft in Edit | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | (LC) Draft in Legal Review | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | (LC) Drafter Assigned |