North Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

North Carolina House Bill H877 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF NORTH CAROLINA
22 SESSION 2025
3-H 1
4-HOUSE BILL 877
3+H D
4+HOUSE BILL DRH10391-MQa-83
5+
56
67
78 Short Title: Childcare Pilot. (Public)
8-Sponsors: Representatives Arp, Lambeth, Paré, and Rhyne (Primary Sponsors).
9-For a complete list of sponsors, refer to the North Carolina General Assembly web site.
10-Referred to: Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
11-April 10, 2025
12-*H877 -v-1*
9+Sponsors: Representative Arp.
10+Referred to:
11+
12+*DRH10391 -MQa-83*
1313 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED 1
1414 AN ACT TO ESTABLISH A PILOT PROGRAM INVOLVING A PUBLIC -PRIVATE 2
1515 PARTNERSHIP TO PROVIDE REDUCED COST CHILDCARE BY LEVERAGING 3
1616 STATE RESOURCES TO REDUCE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH ESTABLISHING A 4
1717 CHILDCARE FACILITY. 5
1818 Whereas, the General Assembly recognizes that childcare availability is essential to 6
1919 enabling all those individuals who wish to participate in the workforce to do so; and 7
2020 Whereas, the General Assembly also recognizes that the costs of childcare need to be 8
2121 lowered to enable more individuals to be able to afford to leave home and either go to work or 9
2222 return to work after having a child; and 10
2323 Whereas, assuring quality childcare opportunities in every county within the State 11
2424 supports the potential for employers to make economic investments in all the State's 100 counties; 12
2525 and 13
2626 Whereas, being able to take advantage of quality childcare facilities within their local 14
2727 communities at a below market rate cost will enable more parents to enter or reenter the 15
2828 workplace; and 16
2929 Whereas, the General Assembly recognizes that one of the ways to reduce the costs 17
3030 of childcare to consumers is by lowering the one-time capital costs of the land, site infrastructure, 18
3131 and the building that will house the childcare operation; and 19
3232 Whereas, the General Assembly further recognizes that another way to lower those 20
3333 capital costs is through the repurposing of an existing publicly owned building and its site 21
3434 infrastructure; and 22
3535 Whereas, to promote the development of quality childcare facilities in all counties of 23
3636 the State, the General Assembly implements the following pilot public-private (P3) project as a 24
3737 demonstration of how publicly owned property and one-time public capital funding can be 25
3838 leveraged to result in a quality childcare facility; Now, therefore, 26
3939 The General Assembly of North Carolina enacts: 27
4040 SECTION 1.(a) The Legislative Services Office shall, by October 15, 2025, working 28
4141 collaboratively with the State Construction Office and the Department of Administration, 29
4242 develop a comprehensive process for implementing a demonstration pilot project to select a 30
4343 third-party childcare operator as the public-private partner (P3) for the project. The process shall 31
4444 include, at a minimum, (i) the development of a request for proposals to competitively select the 32
4545 P3 partner to be the operator of the childcare facility, (ii) the basic methodology of scoring the 33
4646 proposals received to select a P3 partner where that scoring criteria can be expanded to include 34
47-additional considerations being proposed a respondent, and (iii) a base P3 contract to be used to 35 General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
48-Page 2 House Bill 877-First Edition
47+additional considerations being proposed a respondent, and (iii) a base P3 contract to be used to 35
48+H.B. 877
49+Apr 9, 2025
50+HOUSE PRINCIPAL CLERK General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
51+Page 2 DRH10391-MQa-83
4952 negotiate a final agreement with the selected P3 partner. The Legislative Services Office shall 1
5053 issue the initial request for proposals no later than January 2, 2026. 2
5154 The Legislative Services Office shall extend an invitation to participate, as a partner, 3
5255 to a constituent institution of The University of North Carolina System that is located within the 4
5356 same county as the demonstration project. If that constituent institution accepts, it may participate 5
5457 by providing either a site for the facility or a portion of the funding, or some combination thereof. 6
5558 Based upon the level of participation as mutually agreed by the consistent institution and the 7
5659 Legislative Services Office, a commensurate share of the childcare spaces shall be made available 8
5760 on a first priority basis for employees of that constituent institution. 9
5861 SECTION 1.(b) The Legislative Services Office, in conjunction with the State 10
5962 Construction Office, shall select a site from available State- or University-owned lands suitable 11
6063 for the construction of a shell building and shall issue a request for information and a request for 12
6164 proposal regarding the execution of a ground lease with a third party with evidence supporting 13
6265 the ability to operate a childcare facility as described in subsection (c) of this section. The ground 14
6366 lease shall not exceed five hundred dollars ($500.00) per month, with a preferred initial term of 15
6467 at least 10 years. Lease renewals of at least four years may be included in the agreement, provided 16
6568 that the performance of the lessor is satisfactory to the Legislative Services Office. The third 17
6669 party selected by the Legislative Services Office shall submit a site plan that will be adapted and 18
6770 developed for the site and shell building. The third party selected to operate the childcare facility 19
6871 will be responsible for the upfit of the building, building and site maintenance, utilities, and all 20
6972 other operating costs. The State may also partner with a constituent institution of The University 21
7073 of North Carolina in the selection of a University-owned site as described in subsection (a) of 22
7174 this section. 23
7275 SECTION 1.(c) The third party selected for the operation of the childcare facility 24
7376 described in this section shall be able to meet at least all of the following criteria: 25
7477 (1) Demonstrates the ability and commits to provide childcare rates that are 26
7578 twenty-five percent (25%) or more below the current market rates for the area 27
7679 where the facility is to be located using a modified pro forma that eliminates 28
7780 the cost of land, the cost of site improvements, the cost of utility extensions 29
7881 and connection, the cost of the shell building and the anticipated costs of 30
7982 construction loan interest. The respondent with the greatest reduction below 31
8083 the current market rate shall receive the highest score for this category. 32
8184 (2) Capable of operating a facility licensed under Chapter 110 of the General 33
8285 Statutes that will enroll at least 180 children. 34
8386 (3) Agrees to pay a wage to all childcare providers employed by the facility equal 35
8487 to at least one hundred eighty percent (180%) of the federal minimum wage, 36
8588 as of January 1, 2025, for the first year services are provided under the lease 37
8689 agreement, and an annual increase of at least two and one-half percent (2.5%) 38
8790 for at least the first four years thereafter, without changing the rates charged 39
8891 to consumers for a period of at least four years. 40
8992 (4) Agrees to provide health insurance for all of the full-time employees. For the 41
9093 purposes of this subdivision, the provision of health insurance means that the 42
9194 employer pays at least fifty percent (50%) of the premiums for health care 43
9295 coverage that equals or exceeds the minimum requirements for small group 44
9396 health benefit plans under State or federal law. 45
9497 (5) Agrees to provide priority placement for eighty percent (80%) of available 46
9598 childcare capacity at the site to State employees, including employees of a 47
9699 constituent institution of The University of North Carolina that partners with 48
97100 the Legislative Services Office as described in this section. 49
98101 SECTION 2. Notwithstanding G.S. 143C-5-2, there is appropriated from the 50
99102 General Fund to the Legislative Services Office the sum of five million dollars ($5,000,000) in 51 General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
100-House Bill 877-First Edition Page 3
103+DRH10391-MQa-83 Page 3
101104 nonrecurring funds for the 2025-2026 fiscal year to be used for the childcare pilot program 1
102105 described in Section 1 of this act. The funds appropriated in this section shall not revert until July 2
103106 1, 2027. 3
104107 SECTION 3. Section 2 of this act becomes effective July 1, 2025. The remainder of 4
105108 this act is effective when it becomes law. 5