House | 04/30/2025 | Placed On Cal For 05/01/2025 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reptd Fav | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Re-ref to the Com on Emergency Management and Disaster Recovery, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Withdrawn From Com | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Passed 1st Reading | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Filed |