North Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

North Carolina Senate Bill S321 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF NORTH CAROLINA
22 SESSION 2025
3-S 1
4-SENATE BILL 321
3+S D
4+SENATE BILL DRS35125-NN-24
5+
56
67
78 Short Title: Accounting Workforce Development Act. (Public)
89 Sponsors: Senators Britt, Overcash, and Lazzara (Primary Sponsors).
9-Referred to: Rules and Operations of the Senate
10-March 19, 2025
11-*S321 -v-1*
10+Referred to:
11+
12+*DRS35125 -NN-24*
1213 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED 1
1314 AN ACT TO MODIFY THE EDUCATIONAL AND EXPERIENCE REQUIREMENTS FOR 2
1415 CERTIFICATION AS A CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANT . 3
1516 The General Assembly of North Carolina enacts: 4
1617 SECTION 1.(a) G.S. 93-12 reads as rewritten: 5
1718 "§ 93-12. Board of Certified Public Accountant Examiners. 6
1819 The name of the State Board of Accountancy is hereby changed to State Board of Certified 7
1920 Public Accountant Examiners and said name State Board of Certified Public Accountant 8
2021 Examiners is hereby substituted for the name State Board of Accountancy wherever the latter 9
2122 name appears or is used in Chapter 93 of the General Statutes. Said Board is created as an agency 10
2223 of the State of North Carolina and shall consist of seven members to be appointed by the 11
2324 Governor, five persons to be holders of valid and unrevoked certificates as certified public 12
2425 accountants issued under the provisions of this Chapter and two persons who are not certified 13
2526 public accountants who shall represent the interest of the public at large. Members of the Board 14
2627 shall hold office for the term of three years and until their successors are appointed. Appointments 15
2728 to the Board shall be made under the provisions of this Chapter as and when the terms of the 16
2829 members of the present State Board of Accountancy expire; provided, that all future 17
2930 appointments to said Board shall be made for a term of three years expiring on the thirtieth day 18
3031 of June. All Board members serving on June 30, 1980, shall be eligible to complete their 19
3132 respective terms. No member appointed to a term on or after July 1, 1980, shall serve more than 20
3233 two complete consecutive terms. The powers and duties of the Board shall be as follows: 21
3334 … 22
3435 (5) To issue certificates of qualification admitting to practice as certified public 23
3536 accountants, each applicant who, having the qualifications herein specified, 24
3637 has passed an examination to the satisfaction of the Board, in "accounting," 25
3738 "auditing," "business law," and other related subjects. 26
3839 A person is eligible to take the examination given by the Board, or to 27
3940 receive a certificate of qualification to practice as a certified public 28
4041 accountant, if the person is a citizen of the United States, has declared the 29
4142 intention of becoming a citizen, is a resident alien, or is a citizen of a foreign 30
4243 jurisdiction which extends to citizens of this State like or similar privileges to 31
4344 be examined or certified, is 18 years of age or over, and is of good moral 32
4445 character. 33
4546 To be eligible to take the examination given by the Board, a person shall 34
4647 submit evidence satisfactory to the Board that the person holds a bachelors 35
47-bachelor's or higher degree from a college or university that is accredited by 36 General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
48-Page 2 Senate Bill 321-First Edition
48+bachelor's or higher degree from a college or university that is accredited by 36
49+FILED SENATE
50+Mar 18, 2025
51+S.B. 321
52+PRINCIPAL CLERK General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
53+Page 2 DRS35125-NN-24
4954 one of the regional accrediting associations or from a college or university 1
5055 determined by the Board to have standards that are substantially equivalent to 2
5156 a regionally accredited institution. The degree studies shall include a 3
5257 concentration in accounting as prescribed by the Board or shall be 4
5358 supplemented with courses that are determined by the Board to be 5
5459 substantially equivalent to a concentration in accounting. 6
5560 The Board may, in its discretion, waive the education requirement of any 7
5661 candidate if the Board is satisfied from the result of a special written 8
5762 examination given the candidate by the Board to test the candidate's 9
5863 educational qualifications that the candidate is as well qualified as if the 10
5964 candidate met the education requirements specified above. The Board may 11
6065 provide by regulation for the general scope of such examinations and may 12
6166 obtain such advice and assistance as it deems appropriate to assist it in 13
6267 preparing, administering and grading such special examinations. 14
6368 To be eligible to receive a certificate of qualification to practice as a 15
6469 certified public accountant, a person shall submit evidence satisfactory to the 16
6570 Board that: 17
6671 a. The person meets one of the following educational requirements: 18
6772 1. The person has completed 150 semester hours and received a 19
6873 bachelors bachelor's or higher degree with a concentration in 20
6974 accounting and other courses that the Board may require from 21
7075 a college or university that is accredited by a regional 22
7176 accrediting association or from a college or university 23
7277 determined by the Board to have standards that are 24
7378 substantially equivalent to those of a regionally accredited 25
7479 institution. 26
7580 2. The person has received a bachelor's degree with a 27
7681 concentration in accounting and other courses that the Board 28
7782 may require from a college or university that is either 29
7883 accredited by a regional accrediting association or determined 30
7984 by the Board to have standards substantially equivalent to 31
8085 those of a regionally accredited institution. 32
8186 b. The person has the endorsement as to the person's eligibility of three 33
8287 certified public accountants who currently hold licenses in any state or 34
8388 territory of the United States or the District of Columbia. 35
8489 c. The person has one of the following: 36
8590 1. One year's Only as to those persons applying for a certificate 37
8691 based on the educational requirements of sub-sub-subdivision 38
8792 1. of sub-subdivision a. of this subdivision, one year of 39
8893 experience in the field of accounting under the direct 40
8994 supervision of a certified public accountant who currently 41
9095 holds a valid license in any state or territory of the United 42
9196 States or the District of Columbia. 43
9297 1a. Only as to those persons applying for a certificate based on the 44
9398 educational requirements of sub-sub-subdivision 2. of 45
9499 sub-subdivision a. of this subdivision, two years of experience 46
95100 in the field of accounting under the direct supervision of a 47
96101 certified public accountant who currently holds a valid license 48
97102 in any state or territory of the United States or the District of 49
98103 Columbia. 50 General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
99-Senate Bill 321-First Edition Page 3
104+DRS35125-NN-24 Page 3
100105 2. Four years of experience teaching accounting in a four-year 1
101106 college or university accredited by one of the regional 2
102107 accrediting associations or in a college or university 3
103108 determined by the Board to have standards substantially 4
104109 equivalent to a regionally accredited institution. 5
105110 3. Four years of experience in the field of accounting. 6
106111 4. Four years of experience teaching college transfer accounting 7
107112 courses at a community college or technical institute accredited 8
108113 by one of the regional accrediting associations. 9
109114 5. Any combination of such experience determined by the Board 10
110115 to be substantially equivalent to the foregoing. 11
111116 The Board may permit persons otherwise eligible to take its 12
112117 examinations and withhold certificates until the person has had the 13
113118 required experience. 14
114119 …." 15
115120 SECTION 1.(b) The State Board of Certified Public Accountant Examiners may 16
116121 adopt rules to implement the provisions of this section. 17
117122 SECTION 2. This act becomes effective January 1, 2026. 18