North Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

North Carolina Senate Bill S550 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF NORTH CAROLINA
22 SESSION 2025
3-S 1
4-SENATE BILL 550
3+S D
4+SENATE BILL DRS15254-TC-4
5+
56
67
78 Short Title: Coaches Care Act. (Public)
89 Sponsors: Senators Theodros and Mohammed (Primary Sponsors).
9-Referred to: Rules and Operations of the Senate
10-March 26, 2025
11-*S550 -v-1*
10+Referred to:
11+
12+*DRS15254 -TC-4*
1213 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED 1
1314 AN ACT TO REQUIRE YOUTH ATHLETICS COACHES TO RECEIVE TRAINING IN 2
1415 YOUTH MENTAL HEALTH FIRST AID . 3
1516 The General Assembly of North Carolina enacts: 4
1617 SECTION 1. G.S. 115C-407.55(2) reads as rewritten: 5
1718 "(2) Student health and safety rules. – These rules shall govern requirements to 6
1819 ensure student health and safety during participation in interscholastic athletic 7
1920 activities, including rules related to concussionsconcussions, youth mental 8
2021 health first aid, and emergency action plans as required by 9
2122 G.S. 115C-407.57G.S. 115C-407.57, G.S. 115C-407.57A, and 10
2223 G.S. 115C-407.58. The adoption of these rules shall not be delegated to an 11
2324 administering organization and student health and safety rules shall not be 12
2425 altered or expanded by an administering organization." 13
2526 SECTION 2. Article 29E of Chapter 115C is amended by adding a new section to 14
2627 read: 15
2728 "§ 115C-407.57A. Rules on mental health first aid training for coaches. 16
2829 (a) For the purposes of this section, a "training program" is a youth mental health first 17
2930 aid program that offers training and certification in the following: 18
3031 (1) Recognizing the signs and symptoms of mental health challenges and 19
3132 substance abuse. 20
3233 (2) Assisting youth that are experiencing mental health challenges. 21
3334 (3) Connecting youth with professional resources that can provide additional care. 22
3435 (b) The State Board of Education shall consult with the Center for Safer Schools, the 23
3536 Department of Health and Human Services, and the University of North Carolina School of 24
3637 Social Work on the selection of approved training programs. The State Board of Education shall 25
3738 annually publish on the State Board of Education's website a list of approved training programs 26
3839 no later than March 1. 27
3940 (c) With regard to middle schools and high schools, the State Board of Education shall 28
4041 adopt rules that require all coaches and athletic directors to possess an unexpired certification 29
4142 from a training program approved by the State Board of Education. 30
4243 (d) Each middle and high school shall maintain complete and accurate records of its 31
4344 compliance with the requirements of this section." 32
4445 SECTION 3. Article 18 of Chapter 160A is amended by adding a new section to 33
4546 read: 34
4647 "§ 160A-358. Youth athletics. 35
47-(a) For the purposes of this section, the following definitions apply: 36 General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
48-Page 2 Senate Bill 550-First Edition
48+(a) For the purposes of this section, the following definitions apply: 36
49+FILED SENATE
50+Mar 25, 2025
51+S.B. 550
52+PRINCIPAL CLERK General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
53+Page 2 DRS15254-TC-4
4954 (1) A youth athletics organization is any local government entity, nonprofit 1
5055 organization, or other entity that organizes and conducts athletic competitions 2
5156 for participation by persons under the age of 18. 3
5257 (2) A coach is any person over the age of 18 that provides instruction in athletics 4
5358 to persons under the age of 18. 5
5459 (b) No county or city shall allow a youth athletics organization to access county or city 6
5560 owned parks, recreational centers, or recreational facilities unless the youth athletics organization 7
5661 can demonstrate that all coaches possess an unexpired certification from a youth mental health 8
5762 first aid training program approved by the State Board of Education pursuant to 9
5863 G.S. 115C-407.57A. 10
5964 (c) Each county and city shall maintain complete and accurate records of its compliance 11
6065 with the requirements of this section." 12
6166 SECTION 4. The State Board of Education shall select The National Council for 13
6267 Mental Wellbeing's Youth Mental Health First Aid course and Teen Mental Health First Aid 14
6368 course as the approved training programs and publish that selection no later than March 1, 2026 15
6469 and annually thereafter until March 1, 2030, if the National Council for Mental Wellbeing 16
6570 continues to offer those courses. The State Board of Education may review those courses and 17
6671 select other courses as provided in G.S. 115C-407.57A for publication beginning March 1, 2031, 18
6772 or if there is evidence of substantial changes to the curriculum of those courses before March 1, 19
6873 2031. 20
6974 SECTION 5. The act is effective when it becomes law and applies beginning on July 21
7075 1, 2026. 22