North Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

North Carolina Senate Bill S572 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF NORTH CAROLINA
22 SESSION 2025
3-S 1
4-SENATE BILL 572
3+S D
4+SENATE BILL DRS45135-MRa-87
5+
56
67
78 Short Title: Greater Access to Fertility Medication. (Public)
89 Sponsors: Senator Murdock (Primary Sponsor).
9-Referred to: Rules and Operations of the Senate
10-March 26, 2025
11-*S572 -v-1*
10+Referred to:
11+
12+*DRS45135 -MRa-87*
1213 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED 1
1314 AN ACT TO INCREASE ACCESS TO FERTILITY MEDICATION UNDER CERTAIN 2
1415 HEALTH BENEFIT PLANS THAT OFFER FERTILITY TREATMENT COVERAGE 3
1516 AND UNDER THE STATE HEALTH PLAN FOR TEACHERS AND STATE 4
1617 EMPLOYEES. 5
1718 The General Assembly of North Carolina enacts: 6
1819 SECTION 1.(a) Article 3 of Chapter 58 of the General Statutes is amended by adding 7
1920 a new section to read: 8
2021 "ยง 58-3-241. Fertility treatment coverage. 9
2122 (a) The following definitions apply in this section: 10
2223 (1) Experimental fertility procedure. โ€“ A procedure for which the published 11
2324 medical evidence is not sufficient for the American Society of Reproductive 12
2425 Medicine, its successor organization, or a comparable organization to regard 13
2526 the procedure as an established medical practice. 14
2627 (2) Fertility treatment. โ€“ A procedure, healthcare product, medication, or 15
2728 healthcare service intended to achieve pregnancy consistent with the 16
2829 established medical practice and professional guidelines published by the 17
2930 American Society of Reproductive Medicine, its successor organization, or a 18
3031 comparable organization. 19
3132 (3) Insurer. โ€“ As defined in G.S. 58-3-167. 20
3233 (b) If a health benefit plan offered by an insurer provides coverage for any fertility 21
3334 treatment, then all of the following shall apply: 22
3435 (1) Any limitation on coverage for ovulation medication shall not be different 23
3536 than the limitations imposed on other prescription medications. 24
3637 (2) No annual or lifetime limitations shall apply to the coverage for ovulation 25
3738 medication and ovulation induction cycles for services provided by healthcare 26
3839 providers that participate in the provider network of the health benefit plan. 27
3940 (c) Nothing in this section shall be construed to require coverage for fertility treatment 28
4041 or experimental fertility procedures under a health benefit plan." 29
4142 SECTION 1.(b) This section is effective October 1, 2025, and applies to insurance 30
4243 contracts issued, renewed, or amended on or after that date. 31
4344 SECTION 2. Effective with the January 1, 2026, plan coverage year, the Board of 32
4445 Trustees for the North Carolina State Health Plan for Teachers and State Employees (State Health 33
4546 Plan) shall remove any annual or lifetime limitations on the coverage for ovulation medication 34
46-and ovulation induction cycles for services offered in-network under the State Health Plan. Any 35 General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
47-Page 2 Senate Bill 572-First Edition
47+and ovulation induction cycles for services offered in-network under the State Health Plan. Any 35
48+FILED SENATE
49+Mar 25, 2025
50+S.B. 572
51+PRINCIPAL CLERK General Assembly Of North Carolina Session 2025
52+Page 2 DRS45135-MRa-87
4853 limitation on coverage for ovulation medication shall not be different than the limitations 1
4954 imposed on other prescription medications. 2
5055 SECTION 3. Effective July 1, 2025, there is appropriated from the General Fund to 3
5156 the Department of State Treasurer the sum of three hundred thousand dollars ($300,000) in 4
5257 recurring funds for the 2025-2026 fiscal year and the sum of six hundred thousand dollars 5
5358 ($600,000) in recurring funds for the 2026-2027 fiscal year for the increased costs to the State 6
5459 Health Plan as a result of the implementation of Section 2 of this act. 7
5560 SECTION 4. Except as otherwise provided, this act is effective when it becomes 8
5661 law. 9