North Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

North Carolina Senate Bill S715 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF NORTH CAROLINA
22 SESSION 2025
3-S 1
4-SENATE BILL 715
3+S D
4+SENATE BILL DRS45356-NGa-46
5+
56
67
78 Short Title: Student Voter ID Grant Program/CCs. (Public)
89 Sponsors: Senators Meyer and Murdock (Primary Sponsors).
9-Referred to: Rules and Operations of the Senate
10-March 26, 2025
11-*S715 -v-1*
10+Referred to:
11+
12+*DRS45356 -NGa-46*
1213 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED 1
1314 AN ACT TO APPROPRIATE FUNDS TO REQUIRE THE STATE BOARD OF 2
1415 COMMUNITY COLLEGES TO ESTABLISH THE STUDENT VOTER 3
1516 IDENTIFICATION GRANT PROGRAM AND TO ENCOURAGE COMMUNITY 4
1617 COLLEGES TO APPLY FOR GRANTS UNDER THE PROGRAM. 5
1718 The General Assembly of North Carolina enacts: 6
1819 SECTION 1.(a) There is appropriated from the General Fund to the Community 7
1920 Colleges System Office the sum of five hundred thousand dollars ($500,000) in nonrecurring 8
2021 funds for the 2025-2026 fiscal year for the State Board of Community Colleges to establish the 9
2122 Student Voter Identification Grant Program (Program) to provide grants to community colleges 10
2223 of up to twenty thousand dollars ($20,000) per community college to upgrade necessary 11
2324 equipment and facilities to produce student identification cards that can be used to vote in person 12
2425 in accordance with G.S. 163-166.16. The State Board shall develop a process for receiving 13
2526 applications from community colleges and award grants no later than August 15, 2025, to any 14
2627 community college that submits a reasonable and timely plan for the expenditure of funds 15
2728 consistent with the purposes of the Program. No community college shall receive more than one 16
2829 grant under the Program. No later than February 15, 2026, the System Office shall report to the 17
2930 Joint Legislative Education Oversight Committee on the identity of the community colleges 18
3031 receiving grants under the Program and the purchases made with the funds awarded. 19
3132 SECTION 1.(b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, the 20
3233 State Board of Elections shall review and approve the application of any community college 21
3334 receiving funds under the Student Voter Identification Grant Program established in subsection 22
3435 (a) of this section that is submitted to the State Board by September 1, 2025, to have its student 23
3536 identification cards approved for use as photo identification cards, if the application complies 24
3637 with other requirements for such an application established by the State Board. 25
3738 SECTION 2. It is the intent of the General Assembly (i) to encourage all community 26
3839 colleges in the State that do not have student identification cards that can be used to vote in person 27
3940 in accordance with G.S. 163-166.16 to apply to receive grants under the Student Voter 28
4041 Identification Grant Program established pursuant to Section 1 of this act and (ii) that the Program 29
4142 remove the existing financial barriers of community colleges to providing students with valid 30
4243 photo identification for voting. 31
4344 SECTION 3. This act becomes effective July 1, 2025. 32
45+FILED SENATE
46+Mar 25, 2025
47+S.B. 715
48+PRINCIPAL CLERK