House
|
04/25/2025
|
Filed with Secretary Of State 04/23
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Signed by Governor 04/23
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Conference committee report adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate reject)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
New conference committee appointed Hogan Rummel Cory
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Conference committee appointed Dressler D. Johnston Frelich
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Refused to concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Returned to House (12)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Committee Hearing 09:30
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Received from House
|
|
|
House
|
01/15/2025
|
Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2025
|
Committee Hearing 10:00
|
|
|