House | 02/20/2025 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 54 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 20 0 3 | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Rereferred to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Amendment adopted | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 0 | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |