LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
North Dakota ND
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1569
Action History
ND
North Dakota House Bill HB1569
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
North Dakota 2025-2026 Regular Session
North Dakota House Bill HB1569
Action History
House
02/21/2025
Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 65
House
02/20/2025
Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
House
02/19/2025
Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
House
02/12/2025
Committee Hearing 03:30
House
01/20/2025
Introduced, first reading, referred to Education