House | 04/25/2025 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Signed by Speaker | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Signed by President | ||
House | 04/18/2025 | Returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Received from House | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3 | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 3 | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Committee Hearing 09:00 |