Senate | 03/27/2025 | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/26 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Signed by Governor 03/25 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Signed by President | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Signed by Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Returned to Senate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Committee Hearing 02:30 (Education) | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 1 1 |