House | 03/12/2025 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 49 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 4 3 | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Committee Hearing 11:00 |