Senate | 03/27/2025 | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/26 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Signed by Governor 03/25 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Signed by President | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Signed by Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Returned to Senate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 67 nays 26 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Committee Hearing 10:00 |