Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 3, 2025
Fiscal Note January 31, 2025
Bill January 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis January 28, 2025
Analysis January 28, 2025