Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 9, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 03/26/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 03/18/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 03/10/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 03/03/2025 | Andersen name added | ||
Legislature | 03/03/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 03/03/2025 | Business and Labor AM175 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/03/2025 | Rountree AM103 withdrawn | ||
Legislature | 02/12/2025 | Business and Labor AM175 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/12/2025 | Placed on General File with AM175 | ||
Legislature | 01/31/2025 | Rountree AM103 filed | ||
Legislature | 01/30/2025 | Conrad name added | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Date of introduction |