Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 14, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 03/04/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST5 recorded | ||
Legislature | 03/04/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST5 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/04/2025 | Placed on Final Reading with ST5 | ||
Legislature | 02/25/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 02/25/2025 | Rountree AM391 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/25/2025 | Rountree AM391 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/18/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 02/07/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/04/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Date of introduction |