LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB150
Action History
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB150
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB150
Action History
Legislature
03/14/2025
Judiciary priority bill
Legislature
03/14/2025
Bosn FA39 filed
Legislature
01/28/2025
Notice of hearing for February 12, 2025
Legislature
01/15/2025
Referred to Judiciary Committee
Legislature
01/13/2025
Date of introduction