Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Approved by Governor on March 11, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Presented to Governor on March 6, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | ||
Legislature | 03/04/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 02/25/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 02/25/2025 | Riepe AM264 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | Riepe AM264 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/18/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 02/10/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/10/2025 | Health and Human Services AM124 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/10/2025 | Riepe AM189 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/07/2025 | Riepe AM189 to AM124 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/05/2025 | Health and Human Services AM124 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/05/2025 | Placed on General File with AM124 | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Date of introduction |