Legislature | 04/23/2025 | Rountree name added | ||
Legislature | 02/19/2025 | Conrad name added | ||
Legislature | 02/05/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/29/2025 | Wordekemper name added | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Raybould name added | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Date of introduction |