Legislature | 05/01/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM308 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/20/2025 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM308 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/20/2025 | Placed on General File with AM308 | ||
Legislature | 01/29/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Date of introduction |