Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 7, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 03/18/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 03/18/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER23 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/05/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER23 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER23 | ||
Legislature | 02/27/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/27/2025 | Judiciary AM75 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/26/2025 | Passed over | ||
Legislature | 02/10/2025 | Judiciary AM75 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/10/2025 | Placed on General File with AM75 | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Date of introduction |