Legislature | 02/26/2025 | Approved by Governor on February 25, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | Presented to Governor on February 21, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 02/19/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 02/13/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 02/06/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 01/31/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 01/28/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Referred to Revenue Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Date of introduction |