Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB22 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 24, 2025
Fiscal Note March 11, 2025
Fiscal Note February 25, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025
Fiscal Note January 22, 2025
Bill January 9, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 17, 2025

Chaptered

Bill April 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 4, 2025
Analysis January 14, 2025