Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 9, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 04/01/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 03/28/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 03/28/2025 | Dungan AM780 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/26/2025 | Dungan AM780 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Date of introduction |