Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Approved by Governor on March 11, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Presented to Governor on March 6, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 02/24/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 02/19/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 02/19/2025 | Hallstrom AM216 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/13/2025 | Hallstrom AM216 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/11/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 02/05/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/05/2025 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM30 adopted | ||
Legislature | 01/30/2025 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM30 filed | ||
Legislature | 01/30/2025 | Placed on General File with AM30 | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Date of introduction |