Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Approved by Governor on March 11, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Presented to Governor on March 6, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 03/03/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 02/25/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 02/25/2025 | Jacobson AM256 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/25/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER7 adopted | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | Jacobson AM256 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/12/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER7 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/12/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER7 | ||
Legislature | 02/11/2025 | Hallstrom name added | ||
Legislature | 02/05/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/05/2025 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM58 adopted | ||
Legislature | 01/29/2025 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM58 filed | ||
Legislature | 01/29/2025 | Placed on General File with AM58 | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Date of introduction |