Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Raybould AM1254 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Raybould AM880 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Raybould MO221 prevailed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Raybould MO222 prevailed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Raybould MO222 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Raybould MO221 Withdraw AM880 and substitute AM1254 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Conrad MO218 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Conrad MO218 Reconsider the vote taken on MO147 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Conrad MO147 pending
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Raybould AM1254 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Conrad MO217 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Conrad MO217 Reconsider the vote taken on MO146 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/30/2025
|
Conrad MO146 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/15/2025
|
Clouse AM1077 to AM880 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/08/2025
|
Placed on Select File
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Business and Labor AM272 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad MO9 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Raybould MO150 prevailed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Raybould MO150 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad MO145 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad FA78 to FA74 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad FA77 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad FA76 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad MO149 Recommit to the Business and Labor Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad FA75 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad FA74 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad MO148 Indefinitely postpone filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad FA73 to AM880 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad MO147 Recommit to the Business and Labor Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad MO146 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Raybould AM880 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad MO145 pending
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/01/2025
|
Conrad MO7 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Murman name added
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Conrad MO7 pending
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/05/2025
|
Raybould priority bill
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/28/2025
|
Raybould FA26 to AM272 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/28/2025
|
Raybould FA25 to AM272 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/28/2025
|
Business and Labor AM272 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/28/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM272
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/05/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 24, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/24/2025
|
Raybould AM15 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/24/2025
|
Raybould AM14 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/16/2025
|
Referred to Business and Labor Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/15/2025
|
Conrad MO9 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/15/2025
|
Conrad MO8 Recommit to the Business and Labor Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/15/2025
|
Conrad MO7 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|