Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Speaker Major Proposal | ||
Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Meyer AM1246 to AM832 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Clements FA157 to AM832 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Appropriations AM832 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General File with AM832 | ||
Legislature | 02/04/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Date of introduction |