Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB261 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/04/2025

                    One Hundred Ninth Legislature - First Session - 2025
Introducer€s Statement of Intent
LB261
€
Chairperson: Senator Robert Clements
Committee: Appropriations
Date of Hearing: February 18, 2025
€
The following constitutes the reasons for this bill and the purposes which are sought to be
accomplished thereby:
LB 261, introduced by the Speaker at the request of the Governor, is part of the Governors
biennial budget recommendations.
This bill is the mainline appropriations and capital construction bill for the biennium
that begins July 1, 2025, and ends on June 30, 2027.  This measure includes budget
recommendations for all State operations and aid programs.€ The bill includes the appropriate
General Fund transfers as well as transfers between specified cash funds.€ The bill also
includes the appropriate funds for reaffirmed and new construction projects.  Reaffirmed
projects include those projects currently underway that have already received approval and
funding previously but were funded over several years.  In addition to new and reaffirmed
projects set forth in the bill, language is included that provides for the re-appropriation of
unexpended June 30, 2024, appropriation balances for FY 2024-25 to continue or complete
projects.  Finally, it provides the necessary definitions for the proper administration of
appropriations and personal service limitations.
This bill contains the emergency clause and becomes operative on July 1, 2025.
Detailed information regarding the Governors budget recommendations may be found in
the 2025-2027 Biennium Executive Budget Recommendations, which may be viewed on the
Department of Administrative Services State Budget Divisions website at:
https://das.nebraska.gov/budget/publications.html
€
Principal Introducer:________________________________
Senator Speaker Arch, 14
- 1 -