LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB273
Action History
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB273
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB273
Action History
Legislature
03/20/2025
Notice of hearing for March 27, 2025
Legislature
03/19/2025
Notice of hearing for March 19, 2025 (cancel)
Legislature
03/19/2025
Motion to cancel hearing on March 19 prevailed
Legislature
02/06/2025
Notice of hearing for March 19, 2025
Legislature
01/17/2025
Referred to Judiciary Committee
Legislature
01/15/2025
Date of introduction