LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB274
Action History
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB274
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB274
Action History
Legislature
03/26/2025
Health and Human Services AM84 filed
Legislature
03/26/2025
Placed on General File with AM84
Legislature
01/24/2025
Notice of hearing for February 05, 2025
Legislature
01/17/2025
Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
Legislature
01/15/2025
Date of introduction