Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Hunt AM1126 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Hunt AM1126 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Hunt priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 12, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 02/10/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2025 (cancel) | ||
Legislature | 02/07/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Conrad name added | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Date of introduction |