Legislature | 03/20/2025 | Juarez AM727 to AM464 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | Ibach name withdrawn | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | Cavanaugh, M. MO69 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Juarez priority bill | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Business and Labor AM464 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Placed on General File with AM464 | ||
Legislature | 02/03/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Date of introduction |