Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB299 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/07/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Suzanne Houlden 
LB 299 DATE PREPARED: February 05, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0057 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS See below  See below  
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 299 allows eligible aliens to receive public benefits related to employment and retirement.  
 
The only agency reporting a 	fiscal impact is the Nebraska 	Department of Labor (NDOL), who explains that historically, up to 300 
individuals per year were denied unemployment insurance benefits because of citizenship status. N	DOL asserts that additional 
individuals in Nebraska could now apply for 	unemployment insurance benefits who would not have applied before, and that this amount 
is unknown. NDOL uses the assumption of 300 applicants and average weekly benefit for 202 4 ($451.45), combined with the average 
claim duration of approximately 12 weeks, to arrive at its estimated increase in payments of $1,625,220. NDOL further explains that the 
agency would need to 	implement business process changes but does not anticipate technology costs. The source of the insurance 
benefits payments would be Trust funds, and the agency explains that current Trust funds balances will support this increase.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 299                AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Labor 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE:  2/6/2025                                        	PHONE: (402) 471-	4178 
COMMENTS: The Nebraska Department of Labor assessment of fiscal impact from LB 299 appears reasonable. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 299                AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – State 
                                                                                                   Personnel 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                    DATE:  2/1/2025                                        	PHONE: (402) 471-	4178 
COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Department of Administrative Services assessment of no fiscal impact to the 
agency from LB 299. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:   299                  AM:                AGENCY/POLT. SUB:  Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems 
 
REVIEWED BY:     	Gary Bush                                   	DATE:           01/23/2025                	PHONE: (402) 471-4161 
 
COMMENTS: Agree with the agency’s estimate of No Fiscal Impact.  
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 299 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Administrative Services (DAS) – State 
Personnel 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Sean Davis 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/17/25 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-4439 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
REVOLVING 
FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB 299 requires provision of public benefits, including employment benefits, to eligible aliens. This includes 
retirement benefits under the State Employees Retirement Act, the Employment Security Law, deferred 
compensation under section 84-	1504, scholarships or financial aid for education, and any other benefit relating to 
employment, including what would apply to the 	eligible alien’s family members or dependents.  
 
State agencies would be required to maintain an approved identification document for each individual as outlined in 
this bill. In Section 4, the Department of Administrative Services ( DAS) is required to prescribe a format for 
individuals applying for public benefits to attest to their eligible alien status.  
 
Aliens with employment authorization currently 	employed by the State of Nebraska have access to employment 
benefits. 
 
There is no identified fiscal impact to the Department of Administrative Services. 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 299 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Labor 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Rea Easton 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/5/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-416-6809 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
TRUST FUNDS 
 
1,625,220   1,625,220   
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
1,625,220   1,625,220   
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
As proposed, LB 299 expands unemployment insurance benefits to eligible aliens. Historically, 
up to 300 individuals per year were denied unemployment insurance benefits because of citizenship status. The 
Nebraska Department of Labor believes additional individuals in Nebraska may not have applied for unemployment 
insurance benefits because they knew they would not be eligible. Because the number is unknown, NDOL is estimating 
an additional 300 people would have received benefits each year going forward. The average weekly benefit amount for 
2024 was $451.45 and the average claim duration was approximately 12 weeks. The Nebraska Department of Labor 
anticipates it will pay out $1,625,220 more ($451.45 * 12 * 300) in unemployment insurance benefits each year. NDOL 
would need to implement business process changes but does not anticipate any technology costs. 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 299 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Public Employees Retirement Systems (NPERS)-
085 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Teresa Zulauf Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/23/25 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-7745 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
LB 299- Allow Eligible aliens to receive public benefits relating to employment. 
 
No fiscal impact to NPERS Agency 085 operations expenditures. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26              26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....