Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Lippincott MO158 failed | ||
Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Lippincott MO158 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Conrad MO1 pending | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Lippincott priority bill | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Andersen name added | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Clements name added | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Storm name added | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Conrad MO3 Recommit to the Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Conrad MO2 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Conrad MO1 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed | ||
Legislature | 01/13/2025 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/09/2025 | Date of introduction |