Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 7, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 46-1-2 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST12 recorded | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST12 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Final Reading with ST12 | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Riepe AM591 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Riepe AM591 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 02/27/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/10/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Date of introduction |