Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 04/23/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/02/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/02/2025 | Moser AM20 withdrawn | ||
Legislature | 04/02/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM554 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/20/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM554 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/20/2025 | Placed on General File with AM554 | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Moser priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/13/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Moser AM20 filed | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Date of introduction |