Legislature | 05/01/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Speaker priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/27/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 02/03/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Referred to Executive Board | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Date of introduction |