Legislature | 05/14/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 05/14/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 48-1-0 | ||
Legislature | 05/12/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 05/08/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/28/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Date of introduction |