Legislature
|
02/26/2025
|
Approved by Governor on February 25, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/21/2025
|
Presented to Governor on February 21, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/21/2025
|
President/Speaker signed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/21/2025
|
Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/21/2025
|
Dispensing of reading at large approved
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/18/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST4 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/18/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading with ST4
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/07/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/07/2025
|
Jacobson AM141 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/07/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER2 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/05/2025
|
Jacobson AM141 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/04/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER2 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/04/2025
|
Placed on Select File with ER2
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/30/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/30/2025
|
Natural Resources AM17 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/27/2025
|
Natural Resources AM17 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/27/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM17
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/16/2025
|
Notice of hearing for January 23, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/13/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/09/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|