Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Storer AM1180 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Storer FA133 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER53 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER53 | ||
Legislature | 04/11/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/11/2025 | Storer AM1016 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/11/2025 | Judiciary AM1009 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/11/2025 | Judiciary AM1010 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/11/2025 | Cavanaugh, J. AM1007 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Hunt MO159 failed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Hunt MO159 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Storer AM1016 to AM1010 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Storer AM1016 to AM837 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Cavanaugh, J. AM1007 to AM1010 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Judiciary AM1009 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Judiciary AM1010 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Judiciary AM837 divided | ||
Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Judiciary AM837 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Placed on General File with AM837 | ||
Legislature | 04/01/2025 | Murman name added | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Storer priority bill | ||
Legislature | 01/28/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Prokop name added | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Date of introduction |