Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB399 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/19/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Scott Danigole 
LB 399 DATE PREPARED: February 14, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0055 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 399 changes provisions of the Mutual Finance Assistance Act. 
 
Section 35-1205 is amended 	to reduce the population requirement for rural or suburban fire protection districts and mutual finance 
organizations to 60% (from 80%) of the assumed population of any one county within the district or organization that is eligible to 
receive a distribution from the Mutual Finance Assistance Fund. 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:  399           AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: State Treasurer 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE:   1/28/2025                                      	PHONE: (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the State Treasurer assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 399. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 399                      AM:                              AGENCY/POLT. SUB:  Department of Revenue 
REVIEWED BY:  Ryan Yang                                        	DATE:  2/14/25                                 PHONE:  (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: The Department of Revenue assessment of no fiscal impact to the agency and no General Fund impact due 
to LB 399 appears reasonable. 
  
  LB 0399 	Fiscal Note 2025 
 	State Agency Estimate  
State Agency Name: Department of Revenue  	Date Due LFO: 
Approved by: James R. Kamm 	Date Prepared: 02/14/2025 	Phone: 471-5896  
 	FY 2025-2026 FY 2026-2027 FY 2027-2028 
 	Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue 
General Funds  $ 0   $ 0   $ 0 
Cash Funds         
Federal Funds         
Other Funds         
Total Funds  $ 0   $ 0   $ 0 
    
 
 	Major Objects of Expenditure  
  	25-26 26-27 27-28 25-26 26-27 27-28 
Class Code 	Classification Title 	FTE FTE FTE Expenditures Expenditures Expenditures 
      
      
      
      
      
Benefits………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Operating Costs………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Travel……………………………………………………………………………………………………………    
Capital Outlay…………………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Capital Improvements…………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Total…………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
 
LB 399 amends the language of a mutual finance organization setting property tax rates must exclude levies for 
bonded indebtedness and lease-purchase contracts in existence “on July 1, 1998” to “on or after July 1, 1998”. 
 
LB 399 changed the population requirement for a rural or suburban fire protection district and a mutual finance 
organization which contains within its boundaries to 60% of the assumed population of any one county contained 
in whole or in part within the district or organization residing outside the city limits of any city of the first, primary, 
or metropolitan class in such county shall receive a distribution from the Mutual Finance Assistance Fund.  
 
The operative date for LB 399 is three months after adjournment of the Legislature. 
 
It is estimated that LB 399 will have no impact on General Fund revenues. 
 
It is estimated that there will be no cost to the Department of Revenue to implement this bill. 
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 399 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
State Treasurer 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jason Walters Date Prepared: 
(4)
 January 24, 2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-2793 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
The State Treasurer’s Office doesn’t expect any fiscal impact from LB 3	99 to the office. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………… ……...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....