LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB399
Draft Versions
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB399
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB399
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 19, 2025
Bill
January 17, 2025
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 6, 2025
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 6, 2025
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
February 24, 2025
Analysis
February 13, 2025