Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
Approved by Governor on April 9, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
President/Speaker signed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/27/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading Second
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/20/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/20/2025
|
Riepe AM637 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/20/2025
|
Returned to Select File for specific amendment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/17/2025
|
Riepe AM637 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/04/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/25/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/25/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER11 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/18/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER11 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/18/2025
|
Placed on Select File with ER11
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/10/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/10/2025
|
Health and Human Services AM62 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/05/2025
|
Health and Human Services AM62 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/05/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM62
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/24/2025
|
Quick name added
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/13/2025
|
Notice of hearing for January 23, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/13/2025
|
Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/09/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|