Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Cavanaugh, J. name added | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 25, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 04/17/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/17/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER44 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER44 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER44 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM565 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Speaker priority bill | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM565 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Placed on General File with AM565 | ||
Legislature | 02/24/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Date of introduction |