Legislature | 03/27/2025 | Fredrickson AM782 to AM659 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | DeKay AM778 to AM659 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/18/2025 | Health and Human Services AM659 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/18/2025 | Placed on General File with AM659 | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | DeKay priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/21/2025 | Notice of hearing for March 12, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Date of introduction |